Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Branko Zebec (until 1980-12-18) | 1929-05-17 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Aleksandar Ristic (until 1980-12-31) | 1944-06-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Rudi Kargus (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-08-15 | ||||
Jurgen Stars (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-06-24 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ditmar Jakobs (until 1989-09-21) | 1953-08-28 | ||||
Manfred Kaltz (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-01-06 | ||||
Peter Hidien (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-11-14 | ||||
Ivan Buljan (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-12-11 | ||||
Peter Nogly (until 1980-06-30) | 1947-01-14 | ||||
Uwe Beginski (until 1980-06-30) | 1959-12-13 | ||||
Bernd Gorski (until 1979-10-10) | 1959-10-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Felix Magath (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Bernd Wehmeyer (until 1986-06-30) | 1952-06-06 | ||||
Jimmy Hartwig (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-10-05 | ||||
Caspar Memering (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-06-01 | ||||
Holger Hieronymus (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-02-22 | ||||
Thomas Bliemeister (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-04-10 | ||||
Waldomir Pacheco (until 1980-06-30) | 1959-05-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jurgen Milewski (from 1979-12-02) (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-10-19 | ||||
Horst Hrubesch (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-04-17 | ||||
Willi Reimann (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-12-24 | ||||
Kevin Keegan (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-02-14 | ||||
Hans-Gunther Plucken (until 1979-10-31) | 1954-11-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1979-08-25 00:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1979-09-29 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-01-12 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |