Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Friedhelm Wenzlaff (from 1980-02-11) (until 1981-11-29) | 1940-10-10 | ||||
Heinz Hoher (until 1980-02-10) | 1938-08-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gerhard Heinze (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-11-30 | ||||
Wolfgang Schreiner (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-04-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernard Dietz (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-03-22 | ||||
Peter Fenten (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-09-08 | ||||
Franz-Wilhelm Brings (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-10-19 | ||||
Claus Gebauer (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-09-15 | ||||
Frank Saborowski (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-03-14 | ||||
Hans-Dieter Mirnegg (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-05-24 | ||||
Paul Steiner (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-01-23 | ||||
Norbert Dronia (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-10-19 | ||||
Werner Buttgereit (until 1980-06-30) | 1959-06-15 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Manfred Dubski (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-09-19 | ||||
Franz-Josef Steininger (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-07-09 | ||||
Pascal Notthoff (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-04-27 | ||||
Herbert Bussers (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-10-30 | ||||
Norbert Fruck (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-12-28 | ||||
Thomas Kempe (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-03-17 | ||||
Kurt Jara (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-10-14 | ||||
Edmund Kaczor (from 1980-01-01) (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-12-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Rudolf Seliger (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-09-20 | ||||
Gregor Grillemeier (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-02-17 | ||||
Jurgen Ulitzka (until 1981-06-30) | 1960-11-22 | ||||
Raimund Hiegemann (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-02-06 | ||||
Paul Dorflinger (until 1979-11-30) | 1955-01-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1979-08-24 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |