Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Schumacher (until 1980-06-30) | 1935-10-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernd Giese (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-04-08 | ||||
Jupp Koitka (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-02-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Norbert Steinhauer (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-03-16 | ||||
Bernd Schafer (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-10-24 | ||||
Volker Rieske (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-10-04 | ||||
Gunter Kuczinski (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-09-07 | ||||
Adalbert Grzelak (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-01-03 | ||||
Klaus Seiler (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-01-13 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Helmut Alfes (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-02-11 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Wrede (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-04-05 | ||||
Wilfried Holtkamp (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-09-30 | ||||
Klaus Bergter (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-04-11 | ||||
Josef Votava (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-12-17 | ||||
Hintsche (until 1980-06-30) | |||||
Sturm | |||||
Ranko Petkovic (until 1983-06-30) | 1947-10-21 | ||||
Manfred Lopatenko (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-11-07 | ||||
Paul Scheermann (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-03-18 | ||||
Klaus Wolf (until 1980-10-20) | 1948-07-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1979-08-26 00:00 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |