Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jupp Becker (until 1980-06-30) | 1943-03-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gunther Wienhold (until 1985-06-30) | 1948-01-21 | ||||
Andreas Muller (until 1981-06-30) | 1960-07-09 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Karl-Heinz Wohrlin (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-07-21 | ||||
Gunter Dampfling (from 1979-09-01) (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-01-11 | ||||
Volker Fass (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-02-06 | ||||
Klaus Bury (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-01-24 | ||||
Klaus Steinwarz (until 1980-06-30) | 1950-10-05 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gabor Zele (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-07-08 | ||||
Hans-Peter Schulzke (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-10-29 | ||||
Reinhard Binder (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-10-17 | ||||
Robert Piller (until 1983-06-30) | 1950-07-02 | ||||
Henry Schuler (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-10-06 | ||||
Werner Reich (until 1980-09-30) | 1953-04-29 | ||||
Joachim Low (until 1980-06-30) | 1960-02-03 | ||||
Wolfgang Schuler (until 1980-06-30) | 1958-02-17 | ||||
Hans-Dietmar Deinert (until 1980-06-30) | 1948-10-06 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Heinz Tochtermann (from 1979-10-01) (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-01-22 | ||||
Jurgen Zitzer (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-02-03 | ||||
Reinhard Willi (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-03-26 | ||||
Hans-Peter Backes (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-06-10 | ||||
Ninoslav Crnjanin (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-08-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1979-08-24 00:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |