Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Franz (until 1980-11-30) | 1940-06-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Helmut Pabst (until 1984-06-30) | 1951-04-29 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jurgen Elm (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-06-24 | ||||
Sieghard Heise (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-12-20 | ||||
Dirk Hupe (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-05-29 | ||||
Wolfgang Fabian (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-12-06 | ||||
Michael Blenkers (until 1980-06-30) | |||||
Siegfried Dominik (until 1980-06-30) | 1957-10-30 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Kruger (until 1988-06-30) | 1953-11-29 | ||||
Gunter Diekmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1954-09-22 | ||||
Bernd Elfering (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-10-09 | ||||
Wilfried Seegler (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-12-02 | ||||
Udo Dornhaus (until 1981-06-30) | 1962-01-13 | ||||
Vojin Jovanovic (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-12-20 | ||||
Peter Gorny (until 1980-06-30) | 1958-09-23 | ||||
Dieter Suchanek (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-09-07 | ||||
Breven (until 1980-06-30) | |||||
Franz-Josef Breuer (until 1979-10-31) | 1948-09-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Lenz (until 1983-06-30) | 1954-11-14 | ||||
Joachim Dzieciol (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-11-25 | ||||
Frank Kremer (until 1981-06-30) | 1960-09-01 | ||||
Stefan Hohnjec (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-10-30 | ||||
Achim de Vries (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-06-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1979-08-25 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1979-09-30 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-01-12 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |