Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lothar Buchmann (until 1980-06-30) | 1936-08-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Helmut Roleder (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Uwe Greiner (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-08-08 | ||||
Gerhard Welz (until 1980-06-30) | 1945-02-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernd Forster (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-05-03 | ||||
Karlheinz Forster (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-07-25 | ||||
Bernd Martin (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-02-10 | ||||
Dragan Holcer (until 1981-06-30) | 1945-01-19 | ||||
Arno Schafer (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-08-31 | ||||
Rainer Ruhle (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-06-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hermann Ohlicher (until 1985-06-30) | 1949-11-02 | ||||
Erwin Hadewicz (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-04-02 | ||||
Hansi Muller (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-07-27 | ||||
Roland Hattenberger (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-12-07 | ||||
Bernd Schmider (until 1980-11-30) | 1955-05-03 | ||||
Markus Elmer (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-12-21 | ||||
Helmut Dietterle (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-06-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Walter Kelsch (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-09-03 | ||||
Harald Beck (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-07-29 | ||||
Bernd Klotz (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-09-08 | ||||
Georg Volkert (until 1980-06-30) | 1945-11-28 | ||||
Klaus-Dieter Jank (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-11-23 | ||||
Robert Birner (until 1980-06-30) | 1958-02-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1979-08-25 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1979-09-28 00:00 |
10 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-01-12 00:00 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-02-16 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-04-05 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |