Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wilfried Kemmer (until 1983-10-20) | 1943-11-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Waldemar Josef (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-10-25 | ||||
Joachim Diehl (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-12-01 | ||||
Frank Kloppstein (until 1980-06-30) | |||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gerd Kuhlmeyer (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-09-25 | ||||
Reiner Tafat (until 1982-06-30) | 1956 | ||||
Peter Bengsch (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-05-24 | ||||
Helmut Oschmann (until 1980-06-30) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Peter Ament (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-11-24 | ||||
Reiner Priess (until 1984-06-30) | |||||
Edgar Nobs (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-12-02 | ||||
Klaus-Dieter Schafer (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-01-14 | ||||
Dietmar Rode (until 1982-06-30) | |||||
Manfred Mattes (until 1981-07-30) | 1952-05-01 | ||||
Dieter Winter (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-04-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ralph Speh (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-02-28 | ||||
Siegfried Reich (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-09-29 | ||||
Bernd Idziak (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-07-02 | ||||
Holger Busse (until 1980-06-30) | 1949-02-18 | ||||
Fred Fensch (until 1980-06-30) |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1979-08-25 00:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |