Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Muller (from 1980-04-16) (until 1981-06-30) | 1939-06-24 | ||||
Heinz Lucas (from 1980-02-01) (until 1980-04-15) | 1920-08-10 | ||||
Rolf Muller (from 1979-11-08) (until 1979-12-31) | 1939-06-24 | ||||
Bernd Hoss (until 1979-11-07) | 1939-06-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Vladimir Kovacic (until 1982-06-30) | 1950-03-06 | ||||
Dieter Schlosser (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-02-04 | ||||
Ulrich Gelhard (until 1980-06-30) | 1946-05-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gerhard Pecl (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-04-17 | ||||
Detlef Meyer (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-08-10 | ||||
Erich Miss (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-03-16 | ||||
Norbert Heidemann (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-12-10 | ||||
Michael Loesch (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-08-02 | ||||
Lothar Dupke (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-03-28 | ||||
Rudi Muller (from 1980-01-01) (until 1980-06-30) | 1960-09-28 | ||||
Bernd Budt (until 1980-06-30) | 1958-05-27 | ||||
Rudiger Klug (until 1980-06-30) | 1961-06-15 | ||||
Wolfgang Koch (until 1980-06-30) | 1955-12-22 | ||||
Ingo Pentrup (until 1980-06-30) | 1961-06-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans-Gunter Etterich (until 1980-06-30) | 1951-08-16 | ||||
Karl Heinz Pape (until 1980-06-30) | 1958-08-29 | ||||
Dieter Allig (until 1980-06-30) | 1959-08-06 | ||||
Antoine Fagot (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-07-24 | ||||
Werner Lindecker (until 1980-06-30) | 1952-12-26 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Zorr (until 1980-06-30) | 1956-09-11 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Redder (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-09-25 | ||||
Rainer Jakobs (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-02-01 | ||||
Siegbert Maschotta (until 1981-06-30) | 1961-07-07 | ||||
Peter Wloka (until 1980-06-30) | 1953-07-16 | ||||
Andreas Kunnecke (until 1980-06-30) | 1961-04-29 | ||||
Gerd Sondermann (until 1980-06-30) | 1947-11-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1979-08-26 00:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |