Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heiner Schuhmann (from 1981-04-01) (until 1981-06-30) | 1948-11-04 | ||||
Heinz Elzner (until 1981-03-31) | 1928-12-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Albert Zettler (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-10-06 | ||||
Hermann Lutz (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-11-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jurgen Haller (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-08-31 | ||||
Werner Schreiner (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-08-06 | ||||
Hans Borchert (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-11-11 | ||||
Claus Brandmair (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-05-21 | ||||
Gerhard Kitzler (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-01-13 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerhard Forschner (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-11-26 | ||||
Erwin Wurm (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-08-12 | ||||
Klaus Perrey (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-07-10 | ||||
Rainer Strobel (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-07-05 | ||||
Martin Trieb (until 1982-06-30) | 1961-09-23 | ||||
Joachim Goldstein (until 1981-06-30) | 1962-09-30 | ||||
Peter Hensold (until 1981-06-30) | 1960-10-19 | ||||
Hubert Ost (until 1981-06-30) | 1963-01-13 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Nicolaus Katsaros (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-03-16 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Schabel (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-04-18 | ||||
Hans Jorg (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-11-04 | ||||
Rudolf Sandner (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-10-25 | ||||
Harald Greifenegger (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-11-18 | ||||
Arnulf Klein (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-06-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1980-08-30 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-10-04 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-11-22 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |