Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Hoher (from 1980-12-08) (until 1981-06-30) | 1938-08-11 | ||||
Benno Beiroth (from 1980-12-06) (until 1980-12-07) | 1942-12-10 | ||||
Otto Rehhagel (until 1980-12-05) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Oliver Bucher (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-05-16 | ||||
Horst Dreher (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-09-19 | ||||
Jorg Daniel (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-07-09 | ||||
Volker Diergardt (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-04-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gunter Kuczinski (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-09-07 | ||||
Peter Lohr (from 1980-12-01) (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-09-01 | ||||
Amand Theis (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-11-19 | ||||
Gunther Bansemer (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-08-03 | ||||
Egon Kohnen (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-11-24 | ||||
Heiner Baltes (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-08-19 | ||||
Heinz Wirtz (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-11-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Josef Weikl (until 1988-06-30) | 1954-01-15 | ||||
Ralf Dusend (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-09-28 | ||||
Gerd Zewe (until 1987-06-30) | 1950-06-13 | ||||
Rudi Bommer (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-08-19 | ||||
Dieter Brei (until 1981-06-30) | 1950-09-30 | ||||
Hubert Schmitz (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-04-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gunter Thiele (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-11-07 | ||||
Rudiger Wenzel (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-06-03 | ||||
Wolfgang Seel (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-06-21 | ||||
Thomas Allofs (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-11-17 | ||||
Klaus Allofs (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-12-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1980-08-30 00:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-10-04 00:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-11-22 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-01-31 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-02-28 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |