Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Hoss (until 1981-06-30) | 1939-06-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Dotzauer (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-09-17 | ||||
Karl Armbrust (until 1982-06-30) | 1946-08-21 | ||||
Yves Bischoff (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-04-29 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Schneider (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-10-29 | ||||
Rolf-Dieter Ottle (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-12-20 | ||||
Udo Lay (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-03-13 | ||||
Helmut Zahn (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-09-03 | ||||
Heinrich Schnitzer (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-09-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Heinz-Dieter Derigs (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-10-19 | ||||
Andreas Braun (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-10-17 | ||||
Ulli Loffler (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-07-21 | ||||
Michael Kuntze (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-06-08 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Schulz (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-12-21 | ||||
Norbert Ziegler (from 1980-11-21) (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-08-14 | ||||
Buffy Ettmayer (until 1981-06-30) | 1946-07-23 | ||||
Niels Poulsen (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-10-03 | ||||
Michael Harforth (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-02-09 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Miessmer (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-03-14 | ||||
Bernd Vogtmann (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-04-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Buhler (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-09-18 | ||||
Paul Linz (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Ralf Obermann (until 1982-06-30) | 1963-05-23 | ||||
Ralf Obermuller (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-07-02 | ||||
Jurgen Marek (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-08-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1980-08-31 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-10-04 00:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1980-11-05 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-11-22 00:00 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |