Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dietmar Schwager (until 1982-06-30) | 1940-08-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Norbert Winkler (until 1987-06-30) | 1954-02-18 | ||||
Klaus Herzer (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-09-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Uwe Weigert (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-06-09 | ||||
Reinhard Kroner (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-10-15 | ||||
Gerd Schneider (until 1984-06-30) | 1940-12-18 | ||||
Hermann Luy (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-03-21 | ||||
Roland Hofling (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-06-09 | ||||
Robert Scharf (until 1982-06-30) | 1961-01-09 | ||||
Jurgen Weninger (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-02-25 | ||||
Hubert Klein (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-08-31 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Julio Alvarez (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-09-27 | ||||
Andreas Koch (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-09-23 | ||||
Dietmar Rompel (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-02-02 | ||||
Peter Swiatek (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-10-09 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Etterich (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-08-16 | ||||
Dieter Pfaff (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-08-02 | ||||
Walter Wohl (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-04-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Josef Sarroca (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-08-12 | ||||
Alvarez (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-02-25 | ||||
Werner Hofmann (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-08-31 | ||||
Martin Bremer (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-05-11 | ||||
Holger Anthes (until 1981-06-30) | 1962-08-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1980-08-30 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1980-10-05 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1980-11-23 00:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |