Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Klimaschefski (until 1981-12-09) | 1938-12-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans Eder (until 1984-05-25) | 1934-11-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gregor Quasten (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-10-03 | ||||
Manfred Werner (until 1984-06-30) | 1951-02-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dieter Timme (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-09-23 | ||||
Horst Ehrmantraut (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-12-11 | ||||
Edi Stohr (until 1985-06-30) | 1956-09-17 | ||||
Walter Gruler (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-08-24 | ||||
Robert Juttner (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-11-24 | ||||
Jochem Ziegert (from 1980-12-21) (until 1983-06-30) | 1954-07-25 | ||||
Holger Bruck (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-09-30 | ||||
Jurgen Diefenbach (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-03-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Mohr (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-08-18 | ||||
Witthaya Laohakul (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-02-01 | ||||
Peter Pagel (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-02-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Werner Killmaier (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-04-21 | ||||
Thomas Remark (until 1983-11-30) | 1959-10-05 | ||||
Lothar Wesseler (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-01-21 | ||||
Pierre Dickert (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-08-03 | ||||
Yasuhiko Okudera (from 1980-11-01) (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-03-12 | ||||
Frank Voihs (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-03-27 | ||||
Thorsten Schlumberger (until 1980-12-31) | 1960-10-29 | ||||
Paul Dorflinger (until 1980-08-31) | 1955-01-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1980-08-30 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1980-10-03 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-11-22 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1981-02-10 00:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-02-28 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-04-04 00:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |