Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rudi Fassnacht (from 1981-01-13) (until 1981-06-30) | 1934-12-28 | ||||
Gunther Exner (until 1981-01-12) | 1940-10-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Hans-Jakob Klingen (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-01-10 | ||||
Ralf Zumdick (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Uwe Pieper (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-06-18 | ||||
Horst Blankenburg (from 1980-10-31) (until 1982-06-30) | 1947-07-10 | ||||
Guido Mazany (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-11-22 | ||||
Dieter Agatha (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-12-14 | ||||
Oswald Semlits (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-06-07 | ||||
Karl Heinz Krekeler (until 1981-06-30) | 1951-07-19 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Helmut Gorka (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-04-13 | ||||
Dieter Kramer (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-04-12 | ||||
Martin Krassowski (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-02-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Sandhowe (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-12-14 | ||||
Rainer Leifken (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-02-26 | ||||
Thomas Lander (until 1981-08-31) | 1957-08-22 | ||||
Konrad Eickels (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-06-11 | ||||
Stefan Dietrich (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-12-14 | ||||
Peter Fullborn (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-08-07 | ||||
Bernd Vittinghoff (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-07-09 | ||||
Gunter Wille (from 1980-12-01) (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-11-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1980-08-30 00:00 |
1 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1980-10-03 00:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |