Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Schafstall (until 1981-06-30) | 1937-02-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Carsten Hallmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-10-11 | ||||
Slavko Petrovic (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-08-10 | ||||
Detlef Schneider (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-10-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Karl Richter (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-03-27 | ||||
Dietmar Klinger (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-01-08 | ||||
Matthias Herget (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-11-14 | ||||
Ingo Pickenacker (until 1982-06-30) | 1962-04-07 | ||||
Dieter Peitsch (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-10-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Karl-Heinz Gundersdorff (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-12-25 | ||||
Heinz-Hermann Ufer (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-11-27 | ||||
Jurgen Kaminsky (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-12-07 | ||||
Ulrich Kempen (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-07-07 | ||||
Andreas Keina (until 1982-06-30) | 1961-12-16 | ||||
Dieter Schostock (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-11-26 | ||||
Helmut Kremers (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-03-24 | ||||
Detlef Drescher (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-10-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ralf Bugla (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-02-13 | ||||
Jurgen Sekula (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-05-02 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Timmler (until 1982-06-30) | 1961-10-30 | ||||
Urban Klausmann (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-06-29 | ||||
Karlheinz Meininger (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-02-01 | ||||
Ente Lippens (until 1981-06-30) | 1945-11-10 | ||||
Frank Mill (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-07-23 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Diemand (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-11-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1980-08-30 00:00 |
7 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1980-10-03 00:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |