Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Hilpert (from 1981-02-13) (until 1982-04-22) | 1944-01-03 | ||||
Hubert Schieth (until 1981-02-12) | 1927-01-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Manfred Behrendt (until 1984-06-30) | 1950-10-02 | ||||
Dieter Issel (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-07-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hans-Jurgen Zimmer (until 1984-06-30) | 1951-09-23 | ||||
Peter Russok (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-09-06 | ||||
Burkhard Steiner (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-10-04 | ||||
Helmut Zyla (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-11-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Karl Gerban (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-07-14 | ||||
Gunter Tinnefeld (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-07-28 | ||||
Michael Henke (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Helmut Reiners (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-07-07 | ||||
Jurgen Hunerlage (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-01-18 | ||||
Detlev Kudella (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-08-20 | ||||
Wolfgang Patzke (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-02-24 | ||||
Klaus-Dieter Wolff (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-06-29 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Kunkel (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-02-10 | ||||
Gerhard Drews (until 1987-12-31) | 1954-04-26 | ||||
Hans Faust (from 1980-12-01) (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-07-07 | ||||
Wolfgang Schmitt (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-04-27 | ||||
Ralf Schaffeld (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-04-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1980-08-30 00:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1980-10-03 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |