Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Slobodan Cendic (from 1980-10-25) (until 1982-06-30) | 1938-08-28 | ||||
Hans-Dieter Roos (until 1980-10-20) | 1937-05-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Werner Vollack (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-03-24 | ||||
Rolf Gerstenlauer (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-06-15 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rainer Ackermann (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-06-07 | ||||
Guido Buchwald (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-01-24 | ||||
Dieter Dollmann (until 1983-06-30) | 1947-09-12 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Voise (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-12-08 | ||||
Dieter Renner (until 1981-06-30) | 1949-12-18 | ||||
Peter Stichler (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-01-15 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Eckehard Muller (until 1986-06-30) | 1950-08-12 | ||||
Joachim Muller (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-03-25 | ||||
Wolfgang Dienelt (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-04-24 | ||||
Reiner Alhaus (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-12-27 | ||||
Horst Hayer (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-09-30 | ||||
Toni Kurbos (until 1981-06-30) | 1960-10-20 | ||||
Peter Schulz (until 1981-06-30) | 1960-12-30 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Siegfried Susser (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-07-12 | ||||
Klaus Tauber (from 1980-08-22) (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-01-17 | ||||
Uwe Dreher (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-05-13 | ||||
Werner Nickel (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-08-11 | ||||
Alfred Steinkirchner (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-10-23 | ||||
Wilhelm Reisinger (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-06-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1980-08-31 00:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-10-04 00:00 |
13 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-11-22 00:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |