Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Olk (until 1982-03-13) | 1938-01-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Berlepp (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-02-22 | ||||
Dieter Rudolf (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-05-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Edwin Westenberger (until 1984-06-30) | 1948-10-15 | ||||
Willi Wagner (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-08-05 | ||||
Uwe Beginski (until 1982-12-05) | 1959-12-13 | ||||
Gunter Menges (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-02-11 | ||||
Andreas Karow (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-11-03 | ||||
Gunther Reinhardt (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-09-24 | ||||
Min-Hai Kim (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-12-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Willi Bernecker (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-03-09 | ||||
Oliver Posniak (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-07-12 | ||||
Uwe Hahn (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-07-01 | ||||
Rudolf Collet (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-08-20 | ||||
Willibald Weiss (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-07-18 | ||||
Detlef Bruckhoff (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-04-08 | ||||
Heinz-Rudolf Weiler (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-07-06 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Cestonaro (until 1982-12-31) | 1954-05-14 | ||||
Glenn Jordens (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-09-29 | ||||
Dieter Potschke (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-02-24 | ||||
Horst Neumann (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-11-05 | ||||
Rainer Korlatzki (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-02-23 | ||||
Roland Best (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-09-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1980-08-30 00:00 |
10 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-10-04 00:00 |
4 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-11-22 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |