Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Schlappner (until 1987-06-30) | 1940-05-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Zimmermann (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-02-11 | ||||
Walter Pradt (until 1985-06-30) | 1949-04-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Roland Dickgiesser (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Dimitrios Tsionanis (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-08-31 | ||||
Ulf Quaisser (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-10-12 | ||||
Alfred Schon (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-01-12 | ||||
Gunter Sebert (until 1987-06-30) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Stefan Knapp (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-01-21 | ||||
Oskar Bauer (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-09-24 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Emig (until 1982-06-30) | 1962-06-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dieter Schlindwein (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-02-07 | ||||
Hans Hein (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-05-29 | ||||
Wolfgang Bohni (until 1984-06-30) | 1948-03-06 | ||||
Volker Kispert (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-08-25 | ||||
Roland Luksch (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-05-16 | ||||
Marian Respondek (until 1981-06-30) | 1957-04-02 | ||||
Michael Schussler (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-12-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Buhrer (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-10-20 | ||||
Jurgen Makan (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-07-05 | ||||
Gunter Bruckert (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-12-05 | ||||
Willi Kiefer (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-12-30 | ||||
Matthias Weidenauer (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-01-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1980-08-30 00:00 |
8 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1980-10-04 00:00 |
4 : 2 |
Schema Compare |