Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heiner Ueberle (until 1982-03-21) | 1940-06-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Volker Gebhard (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-04-22 | ||||
Michael Moser (until 1981-06-30) | 1959-10-07 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Otis Nachbar (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-08-06 | ||||
Martin Kunzmann (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-03-05 | ||||
Klaus Rechkemmer (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-05-09 | ||||
Rainer Gotter (until 1982-06-30) | 1946-09-05 | ||||
Friedhelm Sturm (until 1981-06-30) | 1955-11-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Gerhard Schafer (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-04-14 | ||||
Klaus Teichmann (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-11-17 | ||||
Klaus Spannenkrebs (until 1981-06-30) | 1952-07-02 | ||||
Martin Kubler (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-10-26 | ||||
Reiner Ackermann (until 1981-06-30) | 1958-06-04 | ||||
Ante Duvnjak (until 1981-06-30) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Friedbert Hillesheim (until 1981-06-30) | 1947-09-07 | ||||
Wolfgang Krenn (until 1981-06-30) | 1953-01-25 | ||||
Erwin Rupp (until 1981-06-30) | 1954-06-11 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Harry Griesbeck (until 1982-06-30) | 1946-08-22 | ||||
Peter Jakob (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-12-26 | ||||
Wolfgang Loes (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-12-23 | ||||
Klaus Sterz (until 1981-06-30) | 1946-12-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1980-08-30 00:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |