Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Friedel Elting (until 1982-06-30) | 1936-12-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Kieselmann (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-11-15 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Schulz (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-01-04 | ||||
Lutz Philipp (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-05-22 | ||||
Wolfgang Keuken (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-11-05 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Paul Holz (until 1989-06-30) | 1952-09-27 | ||||
Klaus Hassenberg (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-10-14 | ||||
Uwe Montelett (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-07-24 | ||||
Uwe Hansel (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-09-29 | ||||
Horst-Franz Degen (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-11-07 | ||||
Berni Korbel (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-08-01 | ||||
Herbert Sprenger (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-08-31 | ||||
Herbert Lutkebohmert (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-03-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Leo Ricken (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-08-01 | ||||
Reinhard Majgl (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-12-04 | ||||
Werner Albrecht (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-03-30 | ||||
Roland Patzke (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-09-21 | ||||
Peter Muller (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-10-11 | ||||
Ralf Heym (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-11-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1981-08-29 15:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1981-10-11 15:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1981-12-06 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1982-01-10 |
3 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-01-16 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |