Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerhard Kentschke (from 1981-11-23) (until 1982-06-30) | 1942-09-18 | ||||
Willibert Kremer (until 1981-11-22) | 1939-10-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Greiner (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-08-08 | ||||
Valentin Herr (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-07-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Horster (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-27 | ||||
Jurgen Gelsdorf (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-01-19 | ||||
Walter Posner (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-02-22 | ||||
Dietmar Demuth (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-01-14 | ||||
Andreas Fehse (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-11-01 | ||||
Peter Klimke (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-09-01 | ||||
Klaus Meul (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-08-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Peter Hermann (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Markus Elmer (until 1983-06-30) | 1952-12-21 | ||||
Horst Knauf (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-08-16 | ||||
Jurgen Glowacz (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-09-30 | ||||
Klaus Bruckmann (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Kurt Eigl (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-03-07 | ||||
Heinz Pier (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-09-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wolfgang Voge (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-09-15 | ||||
Dieter Herzog (until 1983-06-30) | 1946-07-15 | ||||
Arne-Larsen Okland (until 1983-06-30) | 1954-05-31 | ||||
Christian Beer (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-10-05 | ||||
Peter Szech (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-05-26 | ||||
Christian Sackewitz (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-12-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1981-08-30 15:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1981-10-11 14:30 |
3 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1981-11-18 13:30 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1981-12-15 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |