Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lothar Buchmann (until 1982-06-30) | 1936-08-15 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dieter Stinka (until 1983-06-30) | 1937-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jurgen Pahl (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-03-17 | ||||
Joachim Juriens (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-08-08 | ||||
Ralf Raps (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-10-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Charly Korbel (until 1991-06-30) | 1954-12-01 | ||||
Michael Sziedat (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-08-22 | ||||
Willi Neuberger (until 1983-06-30) | 1946-04-15 | ||||
Bruno Pezzey (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-02-03 | ||||
Peter Reichel (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-11-30 | ||||
Helmut Muller (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-04-12 | ||||
Wolfgang Trapp (until 1981-10-31) | 1957-08-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ralf Falkenmayer (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-02-11 | ||||
Stefan Lottermann (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-03-05 | ||||
Bernd Nickel (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-03-15 | ||||
Armin Gortz (until 1982-12-15) | 1959-08-30 | ||||
Werner Lorant (until 1982-11-30) | 1948-11-21 | ||||
Norbert Nachtweih (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-06-04 | ||||
Joachim Low (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-02-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ronny Borchers (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-08-10 | ||||
Beom-geun Cha (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-05-22 | ||||
Harald Karger (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-10-14 | ||||
Michael Kunast (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-02-14 | ||||
Holger Anthes (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-08-09 | ||||
Helmut Gulich (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-01-16 | ||||
Norbert Otto (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-04-19 | ||||
Bernd Eufinger (until 1981-10-31) | 1961-10-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1981-08-29 15:30 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-10-10 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |