Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jorg Berger (until 1982-10-25) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Oliver Bucher (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-05-16 | ||||
Horst Dreher (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-09-19 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Holger Fach (until 1987-12-31) | 1962-09-06 | ||||
Manfred Bockenfeld (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-07-23 | ||||
Gunter Kuczinski (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-09-07 | ||||
Peter Lohr (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-09-01 | ||||
Amand Theis (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-11-19 | ||||
Gunther Bansemer (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-08-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Josef Weikl (until 1988-06-30) | 1954-01-15 | ||||
Ralf Dusend (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-09-28 | ||||
Gerd Zewe (until 1987-06-30) | 1950-06-13 | ||||
Rudi Bommer (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-08-19 | ||||
Petur Ormslev (from 1981-12-01) (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-07-28 | ||||
Stefan Dauber (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-08-01 | ||||
Joachim Hutka (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-03-22 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gunter Thiele (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-11-07 | ||||
Atli Edvaldsson (from 1981-09-14) (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-03-03 | ||||
Rudiger Wenzel (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-06-03 | ||||
Demir Hotic (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-07-09 | ||||
Ludger Kanders (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-05-27 | ||||
Wolfgang Seel (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-06-21 | ||||
Thomas Allofs (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-11-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1981-08-29 15:30 |
10 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-10-10 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1981-12-22 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |