Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rudolf Kroner (until 1982-06-30) | 1942-01-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Hans Wulf (until 1986-06-30) | 1951-10-31 | |||
1 | Gerhard Siewert (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-02-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Holger Bruck (until 1982-06-30) | 1947-09-30 | ||||
3 | Volker Munn (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-01-10 | |||
3 | Manfred Damerau (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-05-23 | |||
3 | Bernd Huter (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-08-24 | |||
5 | Walter Horch (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-10-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Eplinius (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-09-07 | ||||
Werner Frohnapfel (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-06-12 | ||||
Winfried Doring (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-03-11 | ||||
Manfred Grawunder (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-03-16 | ||||
4 | Armin Hofmann (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-11-24 | |||
7 | Klaus Zaczyk (until 1982-06-30) | 1945-05-25 | |||
8 | Peter Kempa (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-07-11 | |||
11 | Karl Bonisch (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-05-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
4 | Ulrich Wielandt (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-04-22 | |||
6 | Gerhard Grau (until 1984-06-30) | 1947-10-27 | |||
7 | James Weir (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-12-24 | |||
9 | Uwe Pallaks (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-01-17 | |||
10 | Helmut Hampl (until 1985-06-30) | 1950-09-29 | |||
11 | Heinz Traser (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-01-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1981-08-30 15:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-10-10 15:00 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-12-05 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |