Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Kuno Klotzer (from 1981-11-30) (until 1982-06-30) | 1922-04-19 | ||||
Friedhelm Wenzlaff (until 1981-11-29) | 1940-10-10 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gunter Preuss (until 1983-04-20) | 1936-11-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang de Beer (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Gerhard Heinze (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-11-30 | ||||
Wolfgang Schreiner (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-04-11 | ||||
Ulrich Fuchs (until 1982-06-30) | 1961-09-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dietmar Schacht (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-09-28 | ||||
Bernard Dietz (until 1982-06-30) | 1948-03-22 | ||||
Peter Fenten (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-09-08 | ||||
Franz-Wilhelm Brings (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-10-19 | ||||
Claus Gebauer (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-09-15 | ||||
Frank Saborowski (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-03-14 | ||||
Klaus Lambert (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-05-15 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Manfred Dubski (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-09-19 | ||||
Franz-Josef Steininger (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-07-09 | ||||
Pascal Notthoff (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-04-27 | ||||
Herbert Bussers (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-10-30 | ||||
Kees Zwamborn (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-03-28 | ||||
Norbert Fruck (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-12-28 | ||||
Thomas Kempe (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-03-17 | ||||
Guido Szesni (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-06-30 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Roland Wohlfarth (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-01-11 | ||||
Rudolf Seliger (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-09-20 | ||||
Uwe Helmes (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-06-27 | ||||
Rudi Gores (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-09-05 | ||||
Wolfgang Dedic (until 1982-06-30) | 1963-12-17 | ||||
Sang-in Park (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-11-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1981-08-29 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1981-10-09 20:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-12-05 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |