Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willibert Kremer (from 1982-04-15) (until 1982-06-30) | 1939-10-15 | ||||
Vaclav Halama (until 1982-04-14) | 1940-11-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Thomas Zander (until 1987-06-30) | 1951-08-10 | ||||
Gerald Hillringhaus (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-06-22 | ||||
Norbert Kleider (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-09-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Anton Schmidkunz (until 1983-06-30) | 1963-01-03 | ||||
Hans Klinkhammer (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-08-23 | ||||
Jurgen Strack (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-03-22 | ||||
Rudolf Seider (until 1982-06-30) | 1959-12-29 | ||||
Walter Hainer (until 1982-06-30) | 1961-10-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Joachim Goldstein (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-09-30 | ||||
Erich Beer (until 1984-06-30) | 1946-12-09 | ||||
Hans-Peter Alt (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-03-07 | ||||
Michael Perfetto (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-08-03 | ||||
Wolfgang Sidka (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-05-26 | ||||
Horst Wohlers (until 1982-06-30) | 1949-08-06 | ||||
Horst Raubold (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-12-26 | ||||
Uwe Schreml (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-02-07 | ||||
Manfred Eble (until 1982-06-30) | 1958-05-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Leo Bunk (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-10-23 | ||||
Rudi Voller (until 1982-06-30) | 1960-04-13 | ||||
Ivica Senzen (until 1982-06-30) | 1951-05-04 | ||||
Herbert Waas (until 1982-06-30) | 1963-09-08 | ||||
Viorel Nastase (until 1981-08-04) | 1953-10-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1981-08-29 16:15 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-10-10 15:30 |
0 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |