Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Sundermann (until 1982-06-30) | 1940-01-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Helmut Roleder (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Siegfried Gruninger (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-06-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernd Forster (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-05-03 | ||||
Karlheinz Forster (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-07-25 | ||||
Werner Habiger (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-11-03 | ||||
Bernd Martin (until 1982-06-30) | 1955-02-10 | ||||
Rainer Adrion (until 1982-06-30) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Alexandru Satmareanu (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-03-09 | ||||
13 | Gunther Schafer (until 1996-09-30) | 1962-06-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Karl Allgower (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-01-05 | ||||
Hermann Ohlicher (until 1985-06-30) | 1949-11-02 | ||||
Erwin Hadewicz (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-04-02 | ||||
Gunnar Weiss (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-04-15 | ||||
Hansi Muller (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-07-27 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Reichert (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-08-04 | ||||
Walter Kelsch (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-09-03 | ||||
Didier Six (until 1983-06-30) | 1954-08-21 | ||||
Dieter Muller (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-04-01 | ||||
Harald Beck (until 1982-06-30) | 1957-07-29 | ||||
Etepe Kakoko (until 1982-06-30) | 1950-11-22 | ||||
Ilyas Tufekci (until 1981-09-10) | 1960-02-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1981-08-28 19:30 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-10-10 15:30 |
10 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-12-05 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |