Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Schafstall (until 1986-06-30) | 1937-02-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Zumdick (until 1995-06-30) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Reinhard Mager (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-05-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Woelk (until 1989-06-30) | 1954-08-03 | ||||
Ivan Zugcic (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-05-22 | ||||
Heinz Knuwe (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-01-16 | ||||
Hermann Gerland (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-06-04 | ||||
Dieter Bast (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-08-28 | ||||
Michael Jakobs (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-07-18 | ||||
Bernd Storck (until 1983-06-30) | 1963-01-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ata Lameck (until 1988-06-30) | 1949-09-15 | ||||
Michael Kuhn (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-05-06 | ||||
Walter Oswald (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-10-08 | ||||
Reinhold Zagorny (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-09-30 | ||||
Wolfgang Patzke (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-02-24 | ||||
Ulrich Bittorf (until 1982-12-31) | 1959-09-02 | ||||
Christian Gross (until 1982-06-30) | 1954-08-14 | ||||
Rolf Blau (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-05-21 | ||||
Klaus Zagorny (until 1982-06-30) | |||||
Sturm | |||||
Christian Schreier (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-02-04 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Abel (until 1982-06-30) | 1952-06-25 | ||||
Frank Eggeling (until 1982-06-30) | 1963-07-27 | ||||
Dieter Lemke (until 1982-06-30) | 1956-04-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1981-08-29 15:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-10-10 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1981-12-05 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-01-09 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1982-01-26 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-02-20 15:30 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-04-10 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |