Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Koppel (until 1983-06-30) | 1948-05-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Kneib (until 1993-06-30) | 1952-11-20 | ||||
Reiner Wilk (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-11-22 | ||||
Volker Diergardt (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-04-26 | ||||
Olli Isoaho (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-03-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Horst Wohlers (until 1986-06-30) | 1949-08-06 | ||||
Norbert Dronia (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-10-19 | ||||
Dirk Hupe (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-05-29 | ||||
Detlef Schnier (until 1985-06-30) | 1956-08-05 | ||||
Karlheinz Geils (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-05-20 | ||||
Heiko Meier (until 1983-12-08) | 1961-01-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Helmut Schroder (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Ulrich Buscher (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-10-20 | ||||
Pasi Rautiainen (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-07-18 | ||||
Wolfgang Pohl (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-12-30 | ||||
Stefan Kuhlhorn (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-12-07 | ||||
Frank Pagelsdorf (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-02-05 | ||||
Johannes Riedl (until 1983-06-30) | 1950-01-02 | ||||
Bernd Krajczy (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-05-30 | ||||
Peter Krobbach (until 1982-08-31) | 1954-01-15 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Stefan Butz (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-09-13 | ||||
Matthias Westerwinter (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-09-28 | ||||
Gregor Grillemeier (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-02-17 | ||||
Ewald Lienen (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Herbert Reiss (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-02-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1982-08-28 15:00 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-10-16 15:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-12-18 15:30 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1983-01-25 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |