Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dettmar Cramer (until 1985-06-30) | 1925-04-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Greiner (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-08-08 | ||||
1 | Rudiger Vollborn (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Horster (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-27 | ||||
Jurgen Gelsdorf (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-01-19 | ||||
Rudolf Wojtowicz (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-06-09 | ||||
Helmut Winklhofer (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-08-27 | ||||
Walter Posner (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-02-22 | ||||
Klaus Bruckmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Frank Saborowski (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-03-14 | ||||
Dietmar Demuth (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-01-14 | ||||
Andreas Fehse (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-11-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Rober (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Peter Hermann (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Ulrich Bittorf (from 1983-01-01) (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-09-02 | ||||
Markus Elmer (until 1983-06-30) | 1952-12-21 | ||||
Horst Knauf (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-08-16 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Herbert Waas (until 1989-09-30) | 1963-09-08 | ||||
Wolfgang Voge (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-09-15 | ||||
Dieter Herzog (until 1983-06-30) | 1946-07-15 | ||||
Arne-Larsen Okland (until 1983-06-30) | 1954-05-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1982-08-27 18:00 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-10-16 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |