Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Branko Zebec (from 1982-09-19) (until 1983-10-17) | 1929-05-17 | ||||
Helmut Senekowitsch (until 1982-09-18) | 1933-10-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dieter Stinka (until 1983-06-30) | 1937-08-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jurgen Pahl (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-03-17 | ||||
Joachim Juriens (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-08-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Charly Korbel (until 1991-06-30) | 1954-12-01 | ||||
Thomas Berthold (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-11-12 | ||||
Michael Sziedat (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-08-22 | ||||
Mike Kahlhofen (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-10-01 | ||||
Willi Neuberger (until 1983-06-30) | 1946-04-15 | ||||
Bruno Pezzey (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-02-03 | ||||
Heiko Ernst (until 1983-06-30) | 1963-08-18 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ralf Sievers (until 1990-09-02) | 1961-10-30 | ||||
Ralf Falkenmayer (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-02-11 | ||||
Martin Trieb (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-09-23 | ||||
Thomas Kroth (from 1982-11-01) (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-08-26 | ||||
Uwe Schreml (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-02-07 | ||||
Stefan Lottermann (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-03-05 | ||||
Bernd Nickel (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-03-15 | ||||
Armin Gortz (until 1982-12-15) | 1959-08-30 | ||||
Werner Lorant (until 1982-11-30) | 1948-11-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Muller (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-10-16 | ||||
Ronny Borchers (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-08-10 | ||||
Beom-geun Cha (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-05-22 | ||||
Jupp Kaczor (from 1982-09-01) (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-03-23 | ||||
Harald Karger (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-10-14 | ||||
Michael Kunast (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-02-14 | ||||
Holger Anthes (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-08-09 | ||||
Helmut Gulich (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-01-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1982-08-28 15:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |