Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Martin Luppen (until 1983-06-30) | 1936-04-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernd Helmschrot (until 1984-06-30) | 1947-03-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gunter Hutwelker (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-04-15 | ||||
Thomas Esche (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-10-12 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Scheinert (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-10-05 | ||||
Gerd Zimmermann (from 1982-11-15) (until 1983-06-30) | 1949-09-26 | ||||
Erich Sauk (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-01-18 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans-Jurgen Gede (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-14 | ||||
Achim Kropp (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-01-09 | ||||
Bernd Grabosch (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-09-23 | ||||
Dieter Finkler (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-11-10 | ||||
Jurgen Baier (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Michael Kuntze (until 1984-10-31) | 1958-06-08 | ||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Norbert Schmitz (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-12-27 | ||||
Florian Hinterberger (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-12-08 | ||||
Robert Hanschitz (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-06-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Dieter Lemke (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-04-14 | ||||
Hermann-Josef Werres (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-04-10 | ||||
Bernd Vittinghoff (until 1983-09-30) | 1955-07-09 | ||||
Dieter Schatzschneider (from 1982-12-14) (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-04-26 | ||||
Hans Fos (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-11-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1982-08-27 20:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-10-16 15:00 |
0 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1982-11-09 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1982-12-14 20:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1983-02-12 15:30 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1983-03-08 19:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1983-04-02 16:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1983-06-11 16:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |