Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ernst Happel (until 1987-06-30) | 1925-11-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Aleksandar Ristic (until 1983-06-30) | 1944-06-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uli Stein (until 1987-07-31) | 1954-10-23 | ||||
Uwe Hain (until 1987-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ditmar Jakobs (until 1989-09-21) | 1953-08-28 | ||||
Manfred Kaltz (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-01-06 | ||||
Jurgen Groh (until 1985-06-30) | 1956-07-17 | ||||
Holger Hieronymus (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-02-22 | ||||
Dieter Brefort (until 1984-06-30) | 1962-05-13 | ||||
Michael Schmidt (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-08-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Thomas von Heesen (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-10-01 | ||||
Felix Magath (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-07-26 | ||||
Bernd Wehmeyer (until 1986-06-30) | 1952-06-06 | ||||
Michael Schroder (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-11-10 | ||||
Wolfgang Rolff (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-12-26 | ||||
Jimmy Hartwig (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-10-05 | ||||
Allan Hansen (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-04-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jurgen Milewski (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-10-19 | ||||
Lars Bastrup (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-07-31 | ||||
Horst Hrubesch (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-04-17 | ||||
Ralf Brunnecker (until 1983-06-30) | 1963-02-17 | ||||
Borislav Dordevic (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-10-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1982-08-28 15:30 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1982-10-05 20:00 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-10-16 15:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1982-12-17 20:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |