Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerd vom Bruch (until 1985-06-30) | 1941-08-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Homringhausen (until 1984-06-30) | 1964-06-06 | ||||
Hans-Ulrich Wegner (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-05-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Peter Vollmann (until 1990-06-30) | 1957-12-22 | ||||
Norbert Steinhauer (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-03-16 | ||||
Klaus Wischniewski (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-12-08 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andreas Paar (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-01-04 | ||||
Helmut Alfes (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-02-11 | ||||
Rainer Joachimsmeier (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-12-23 | ||||
Jorg Becker (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-02-20 | ||||
Helmut Kasprzik (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-06-15 | ||||
Wolfgang Raabe (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-11-14 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Oehler (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-07-15 | ||||
Labahn (until 1983-06-30) | |||||
Brede (until 1983-06-30) | |||||
Dinter (until 1983-06-30) | |||||
Sturm | |||||
Ralf Dreier (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-06-12 | ||||
Hans-Werner Kornacker (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-08-06 | ||||
Ranko Petkovic (until 1983-06-30) | 1947-10-21 | ||||
Theo Schrage (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-06-01 | ||||
Matthias Rademacher (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-07-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1982-08-28 15:30 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1982-09-08 19:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1982-10-15 19:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |