Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Olk (until 1983-06-30) | 1938-01-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gunther Wienhold (until 1985-06-30) | 1948-01-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rolf Maier (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-04-11 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Wohrlin (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-07-21 | ||||
Frank Wormuth (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-09-13 | ||||
Hans Fabri (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-05-19 | ||||
Adalbert Grzelak (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-01-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Karl-Heinz Schulz (until 1991-06-30) | 1955-12-21 | ||||
Ralf Schopperle (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-11-07 | ||||
Gabor Zele (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-07-08 | ||||
Henryk Kruppa (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-09-20 | ||||
Hans-Peter Schulzke (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-10-29 | ||||
Joachim Low (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-02-03 | ||||
Reinhard Binder (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-10-17 | ||||
Hubert Besl (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-11-25 | ||||
Gernot Jullich (until 1983-06-30) | 1954-01-31 | ||||
Robert Piller (until 1983-06-30) | 1950-07-02 | ||||
Werner Reich (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-04-29 | ||||
Wolfgang Weis (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-08-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Robert Birner (until 1983-10-02) | 1958-02-16 | ||||
Hans Meisel (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-12-04 | ||||
Franz Benz (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-01-30 | ||||
Otmar Ludwig (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-04-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1982-08-27 20:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |