Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Buhtz (from 1983-01-24) (until 1984-10-21) | 1923-09-21 | ||||
Jurgen Sundermann (until 1983-01-23) | 1940-01-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Waldemar Cimander (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-05-27 | ||||
Rolf Lubke (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-11-02 | ||||
Herbert Heider (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-09-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ralf Forster (until 1989-06-30) | 1961-04-25 | ||||
Dieter Finke (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-03-11 | ||||
Rainer Ackermann (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-06-07 | ||||
Guido Buchwald (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-01-24 | ||||
Dieter Dollmann (until 1983-06-30) | 1947-09-12 | ||||
Friedhelm Sturm (until 1983-06-30) | 1955-11-25 | ||||
Markus Gross (until 1983-06-30) | 1964-11-26 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Eckehard Muller (until 1986-06-30) | 1950-08-12 | ||||
Joachim Muller (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-03-25 | ||||
Wolfgang Dienelt (until 1983-06-30) | 1961-04-24 | ||||
Milomir Jakovljevic (until 1983-06-30) | 1954-12-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Andreas Merkle (until 1986-06-30) | 1962-04-17 | ||||
Jurgen Klinsmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1964-07-30 | ||||
Siegfried Susser (until 1983-06-30) | 1953-07-12 | ||||
Klaus Tauber (until 1983-06-30) | 1958-01-17 | ||||
Klaus-Dieter Jank (until 1983-06-30) | 1952-11-23 | ||||
Uwe Dreher (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-05-13 | ||||
Werner Nickel (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-08-11 | ||||
Josip Turcik (until 1982-11-05) | 1952-11-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1982-08-28 18:00 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-10-16 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-12-18 15:30 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |