Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Helmut Benthaus (until 1985-06-30) | 1935-06-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Willi Entenmann (until 1986-03-04) | 1943-09-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Helmut Roleder (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Siegfried Gruninger (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-06-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernd Forster (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-05-03 | ||||
Karlheinz Forster (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-07-25 | ||||
Hans-Peter Makan (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-01-01 | ||||
Kurt Niedermayer (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-11-25 | ||||
Werner Habiger (until 1983-06-30) | 1957-11-03 | ||||
Horst Schlierer (until 1983-06-30) | 1960-06-29 | ||||
13 | Gunther Schafer (until 1996-09-30) | 1962-06-09 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Karl Allgower (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-01-05 | ||||
Asgeir Sigurvinsson (until 1990-06-30) | 1955-05-08 | ||||
Hermann Ohlicher (until 1985-06-30) | 1949-11-02 | ||||
Thomas Kempe (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-03-17 | ||||
Erwin Hadewicz (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-04-02 | ||||
Gunnar Weiss (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-04-15 | ||||
Arthur Jeske (until 1983-06-30) | 1962-09-12 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Reichert (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-08-04 | ||||
Walter Kelsch (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-09-03 | ||||
Didier Six (until 1983-06-30) | 1954-08-21 | ||||
Uwe Bialon (until 1983-06-30) | 1963-08-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1982-08-28 18:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-10-16 15:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-12-18 14:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1983-03-01 19:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Monday, 1983-04-04 15:30 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |