Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Schafstall (until 1986-06-30) | 1937-02-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Zumdick (until 1995-06-30) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Reinhard Mager (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-05-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Lothar Woelk (until 1989-06-30) | 1954-08-03 | ||||
Ivan Zugcic (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-05-22 | ||||
Heinz Knuwe (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-01-16 | ||||
Hermann Gerland (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-06-04 | ||||
Dieter Bast (until 1983-06-30) | 1951-08-28 | ||||
Michael Jakobs (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-07-18 | ||||
Bernd Storck (until 1983-06-30) | 1963-01-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ata Lameck (until 1988-06-30) | 1949-09-15 | ||||
Michael Kuhn (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-05-06 | ||||
Walter Oswald (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-10-08 | ||||
Dieter Kramer (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-04-12 | ||||
Reinhold Zagorny (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-09-30 | ||||
Andreas Bordan (until 1984-06-30) | 1964-05-14 | ||||
Detlef Krella (until 1984-06-30) | 1964-03-04 | ||||
Wolfgang Patzke (until 1983-06-30) | 1959-02-24 | ||||
Ulrich Bittorf (until 1982-12-31) | 1959-09-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Benatelli (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-08-19 | ||||
Christian Schreier (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-02-04 | ||||
Frank Islacker (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-08-29 | ||||
Stefan Pater (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-10-31 | ||||
Thomas Andersson (from 1983-01-01) (until 1983-06-30) | 1956-12-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1982-08-28 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-10-16 15:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1982-10-26 |
6 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1982-12-18 15:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1983-03-08 19:30 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |