Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Manfred Krafft (from 1983-11-02) (until 1985-06-30) | 1937-12-11 | ||||
Ernst Diehl (from 1983-10-27) (until 1983-11-01) | 1949-03-28 | ||||
Dietrich Weise (until 1983-10-26) | 1934-11-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Armin Reichel (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-01-31 | ||||
Ronnie Hellstrom (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-02-21 | ||||
Roland Gruner (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-01-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Herbert Hoos (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-07-18 | ||||
Wolfgang Wolf (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Michael Dusek (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-11-10 | ||||
Hans-Werner Moser (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-09-24 | ||||
Andreas Brehme (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Kurt Lang (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-06-18 | ||||
Hans-Peter Briegel (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-10-11 | ||||
Manfred Plath (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-12-12 | ||||
Franco Foda (until 1984-06-30) | 1966-04-23 | ||||
Stefan Glaser (until 1984-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Werner Melzer (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-05-02 | ||||
Reiner Geye (until 1986-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Tino Lochelt (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-08-13 | ||||
Dieter Kitzmann (until 1985-11-15) | 1964-07-11 | ||||
Norbert Eilenfeldt (until 1984-12-04) | 1956-02-17 | ||||
Hannes Bongartz (until 1984-06-30) | 1951-10-03 | ||||
Theo Gries (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-02-10 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bruno Hubner (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-01-28 | ||||
Thomas Allofs (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-11-17 | ||||
Axel Brummer (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-11-25 | ||||
Torbjorn Nilsson (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-07-09 | ||||
Uwe Frowein (until 1983-11-30) | 1962-03-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1983-08-27 15:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1983-10-08 15:30 |
5 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |