Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dettmar Cramer (until 1985-06-30) | 1925-04-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Nagel (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-11-07 | ||||
1 | Rudiger Vollborn (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Horster (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-27 | ||||
Jurgen Gelsdorf (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-01-19 | ||||
Dieter Bast (until 1986-06-30) | 1951-08-28 | ||||
Rudolf Wojtowicz (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-06-09 | ||||
Roman Geschlecht (until 1985-11-30) | 1961-12-28 | ||||
Helmut Winklhofer (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-08-27 | ||||
Walter Posner (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-02-22 | ||||
Klaus Bruckmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-10-09 | ||||
Frank Saborowski (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-03-14 | ||||
Willi Holzgen (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-08-08 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Patzke (until 1986-10-31) | 1959-02-24 | ||||
Jurgen Rober (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Manfred Pomp (until 1985-06-30) | 1964-10-26 | ||||
Peter Hermann (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-03-22 | ||||
Ulrich Bittorf (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-09-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Herbert Waas (until 1989-09-30) | 1963-09-08 | ||||
Beom-geun Cha (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-05-22 | ||||
Frank Glass (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-05-29 | ||||
Thomas Zechel (until 1985-06-30) | 1965-01-25 | ||||
Wolfgang Voge (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-09-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1983-08-27 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |