Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Udo Lattek (until 1987-06-30) | 1935-01-16 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Saftig (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-01-23 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Raimond Aumann (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-10-12 | ||||
Jean-Marie Pfaff (until 1988-06-30) | 1953-12-04 | ||||
Manfred Muller (until 1984-06-30) | 1947-07-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hans Pflugler (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-03-27 | ||||
Klaus Augenthaler (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-09-26 | ||||
Bertram Beierlorzer (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-05-31 | ||||
Bernd Martin (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-02-10 | ||||
Reiner Maurer (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-02-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Norbert Nachtweih (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-06-04 | ||||
Wolfgang Dremmler (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-07-12 | ||||
Wolfgang Grobe (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-06-25 | ||||
Soren Lerby (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-02-01 | ||||
Bernd Durnberger (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-09-17 | ||||
Hans Dorfner (until 1984-06-30) | 1965-07-03 | ||||
Wolfgang Kraus (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-08-20 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Michael Rummenigge (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-02-03 | ||||
Dieter Hoeness (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-01-07 | ||||
Reinhold Mathy (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-04-12 | ||||
Kalle Del'Haye (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-08-18 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Rummenigge (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-09-25 | ||||
Hans Meisel (until 1984-06-30) | 1961-12-04 | ||||
Stefan Dinauer (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-05-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1983-08-27 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1983-10-07 19:30 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-01-14 15:30 |
0 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1984-01-31 19:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-03-03 14:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-05-02 20:00 |
6 : 6 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-05-09 20:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1984-05-31 18:00 |
7 : 6 PSO |
Schema Compare |