Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Sigfried Held (from 1984-02-01) (until 1984-06-30) | 1942-08-07 | ||||
Gunther Exner (from 1983-10-01) (until 1984-01-31) | 1940-10-14 | ||||
Gunter Hentschke (until 1983-09-30) | 1921-12-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andre Stocki (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-03-31 | ||||
Ingo Brogelmann (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-01-28 | ||||
Helmut Traries (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-10-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Zdenko Kosanovic (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-05-13 | ||||
Frank Kayser (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-09-24 | ||||
Kurt Balewski (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-06-05 | ||||
Hans-Werner Fuchs (until 1986-06-30) | 1951-11-23 | ||||
Peter Langer (until 1985-06-30) | 1950-06-02 | ||||
Karl Rohr (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-07-11 | ||||
Thomas Spanehl (until 1984-06-30) | 1962-11-20 | ||||
Frank Weller (until 1984-06-30) | 1964-06-10 | ||||
Detlef Pirsig (until 1984-06-30) | 1945-10-22 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Bruhl (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-10-08 | ||||
Jurgen Berghaus (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-10-08 | ||||
Ferenc Schmidt (from 1983-12-01) (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-07-28 | ||||
Herbert Bals (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-03-14 | ||||
Volker Brune (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-09-15 | ||||
Stefan Kalter (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-10-30 | ||||
Siegfried Mainz (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-01-27 | ||||
Zoran Vuletic (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-02-28 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Kremer (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-09-01 | ||||
Franz-Josef Schmedding (from 1983-12-01) (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-12-04 | ||||
Uwe Bialon (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-08-20 | ||||
Rainer Wolff (until 1984-06-30) | 1965-02-17 | ||||
Norbert Sobbe (until 1984-06-30) | 1953-12-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1983-08-28 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |