Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Aleksandar Ristic (until 1985-04-15) | 1944-06-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1985-04-15) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Waldemar Josef (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-10-25 | ||||
Bernd Franke (until 1985-06-30) | 1948-02-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Scheike (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-09-11 | ||||
Andreas Kubsda (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-06-15 | ||||
Michael Geiger (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-09-27 | ||||
Franz Merkhoffer (until 1984-06-30) | 1946-11-29 | ||||
Reiner Hollmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-09-30 | ||||
Heiner Pahl (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-02-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Peer Posipal (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-07-03 | ||||
Lars Ellmerich (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-01-02 | ||||
Lutz Fischer (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-03-25 | ||||
Matthias Bruns (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-08-19 | ||||
Manfred Tripbacher (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-02-23 | ||||
Frank Schon (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-09-22 | ||||
Reinhard Kindermann (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-03-10 | ||||
Peter Lux (until 1984-06-30) | 1962-10-04 | ||||
Jaroslaw Studzizba (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-10-28 | ||||
Frank Partzsch (until 1984-06-30) | 1962-11-16 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ronnie Worm (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-10-07 | ||||
Peter Geyer (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-12-11 | ||||
Gunter Keute (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-12-21 | ||||
Ilija Zavisic (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-01-20 | ||||
Peter Zerr (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-11-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1983-08-27 15:30 |
0 : 7 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1983-10-07 20:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-01-14 14:00 |
3 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |