Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Diethelm Ferner (until 1986-06-30) | 1941-07-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Walter Junghans (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-10-26 | ||||
Pavel Macak (until 1987-06-30) | 1957-02-07 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Mathias Schipper (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-09-23 | ||||
Thomas Kruse (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-09-07 | ||||
Michael Jakobs (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-07-18 | ||||
Bernard Dietz (until 1987-06-30) | 1948-03-22 | ||||
Manfred Drexler (until 1985-06-30) | 1951-06-26 | ||||
Peter Stichler (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-01-15 | ||||
Winfried Geier (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-08-23 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Opitz (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-07-16 | ||||
Bernd Dierssen (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-08-28 | ||||
Klaus Berge (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-10-04 | ||||
Theo Bucker (until 1984-06-30) | 1948-07-10 | ||||
Hubert Clute-Simon (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-07-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Olaf Thon (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-05-01 | ||||
Klaus Tauber (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-01-17 | ||||
Michael Skibbe (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-08-04 | ||||
Hans-Joachim Abel (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-06-25 | ||||
Volker Abramczik (until 1984-06-30) | 1964-05-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1983-08-26 20:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1983-10-08 14:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-01-14 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-03-14 20:00 |
3 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1984-03-27 20:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-05-02 20:00 |
6 : 6 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-05-09 20:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |