Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Heese (until 1984-06-30) | 1943-12-31 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Robert Hemmerlein (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-12-03 | ||||
Bernd Helmschrot (until 1984-06-30) | 1947-03-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gunter Hutwelker (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-04-15 | ||||
Thomas Esche (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-10-12 | ||||
Janus Gudlaugsson (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-10-07 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Scheinert (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-10-05 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans-Jurgen Gede (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-14 | ||||
Achim Kropp (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-01-09 | ||||
Bernd Grabosch (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-09-23 | ||||
Dieter Finkler (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-11-10 | ||||
Jurgen Baier (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Michael Kuntze (until 1984-10-31) | 1958-06-08 | ||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Norbert Schmitz (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-12-27 | ||||
Florian Hinterberger (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-12-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Helmes (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-06-27 | ||||
Ralf Schlosser (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-04-07 | ||||
Dieter Lemke (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-04-14 | ||||
Dirk Kurtenbach (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-08-02 | ||||
Hermann-Josef Werres (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-04-10 | ||||
Eduard Kirschner (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-11-09 | ||||
Rudi Gores (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-09-05 | ||||
Bernd Vittinghoff (until 1983-09-30) | 1955-07-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1983-08-27 15:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |