Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hans Eder (from 1984-05-26) (until 1984-06-30) | 1934-11-14 | ||||
Martin Luppen (until 1984-05-25) | 1936-04-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans Eder (until 1984-05-25) | 1934-11-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gregor Quasten (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-10-03 | ||||
Manfred Werner (until 1984-06-30) | 1951-02-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dieter Timme (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-09-23 | ||||
Heiko Meier (from 1983-12-09) (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-01-06 | ||||
Bayram Cakal (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-02-04 | ||||
Frank Wormuth (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-09-13 | ||||
Horst Ehrmantraut (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-12-11 | ||||
Edi Stohr (until 1985-06-30) | 1956-09-17 | ||||
Peter Nogly (until 1984-06-30) | 1947-01-14 | ||||
Ole Rasmussen (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-03-19 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Kollmannsperger (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-07-19 | ||||
Rolf Blau (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-05-21 | ||||
Hubert Schmitz (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-04-15 | ||||
Bernd Beck (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-07-18 | ||||
Peter Kempa (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-07-11 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Heikko Glode (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-07-12 | ||||
Wolfgang Metzler (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-06-23 | ||||
Soren Skov (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-02-21 | ||||
Uwe Frowein (from 1983-12-01) (until 1984-06-30) | 1962-03-03 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Emig (until 1984-06-30) | 1962-06-29 | ||||
Werner Killmaier (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-04-21 | ||||
Rainer Ecke (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-08-31 | ||||
Thomas Remark (until 1983-11-30) | 1959-10-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1983-08-27 15:30 |
0 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1983-10-08 15:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-01-14 14:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-03-14 20:00 |
3 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1984-03-27 20:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |