Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jorg Berger (until 1986-01-04) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Hans Wulf (until 1986-06-30) | 1951-10-31 | |||
1 | Gerhard Siewert (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-02-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Volker Munn (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-01-10 | |||
3 | Manfred Damerau (until 1984-06-30) | 1954-05-23 | |||
4 | Stefan Panierschky (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-11-03 | |||
4 | Uwe Beginski (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-12-13 | |||
5 | Stefan Kuhn (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-12-29 | |||
5 | Walter Horch (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-10-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Eplinius (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-09-07 | ||||
Thomas Freudenstein (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-04-28 | ||||
10 | Mats Nordgren (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-04-09 | |||
11 | Karl Bonisch (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-05-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
4 | Ulrich Wielandt (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-04-22 | |||
6 | Gerhard Grau (until 1984-06-30) | 1947-10-27 | |||
7 | Michael Deuerling (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-02-12 | |||
8 | Peter Cestonaro (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-05-14 | |||
9 | Uwe Pallaks (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-01-17 | |||
9 | Peter Palupski (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-10-10 | |||
10 | Helmut Hampl (until 1985-06-30) | 1950-09-29 | |||
11 | Heinz Traser (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-01-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1983-08-27 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |