Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Olk (until 1985-03-22) | 1938-01-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernd Fuhr (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-04-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Stephan Gross (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-10-23 | ||||
Edmund Becker (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-07-18 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Boysen (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-05-30 | ||||
Klaus Theiss (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-07-09 | ||||
Helmut Zahn (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-09-03 | ||||
Dietmar Roth (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-09-16 | ||||
Gerhard Kleppinger (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Harforth (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-02-09 | ||||
Uwe Dittus (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-08-03 | ||||
Gunter Walz (until 1986-06-30) | 1962-07-25 | ||||
Dumitru Nadu (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-05-10 | ||||
Telat Uzum (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-03-12 | ||||
Rainer Grobs (until 1984-06-30) | 1959-02-11 | ||||
Wolfgang Schuler (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-02-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Emanuel Gunther (until 1987-06-30) | 1954-11-13 | ||||
Michael Kunast (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-02-14 | ||||
Uwe Buhler (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-02-03 | ||||
Gerd Dais (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-08-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1983-08-27 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1983-10-08 15:30 |
5 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-01-14 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |