Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Luis Zacarias (until 1985-06-30) | 1942-10-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gunter Preuss (until 1985-06-30) | 1936-11-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Heribert Macherey (until 1992-06-30) | 1954-11-03 | ||||
Wolfgang de Beer (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Struckmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Markus Kettler (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-08-23 | ||||
Frank Hammerschlag (until 1985-10-31) | 1960-09-28 | ||||
Dietmar Schacht (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-09-28 | ||||
Udo Lay (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-03-13 | ||||
Kees Bregman (until 1984-06-30) | 1947-08-08 | ||||
Hans-Peter Grossmann (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-10-23 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mike Vossnacke (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-01-03 | ||||
Uwe Fecht (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-06-21 | ||||
Manfred Dubski (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-09-19 | ||||
Franz-Josef Steininger (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-07-09 | ||||
Pascal Notthoff (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-04-27 | ||||
Gunter Schlipper (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-08-13 | ||||
Hassan Yilderim (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-08-10 | ||||
Herbert Bussers (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-10-30 | ||||
Kees Zwamborn (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-03-28 | ||||
Helmut Balke (until 1984-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Ralf Heck (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-11-28 | ||||
Hubert Schwarz (until 1984-06-30) | 1958-01-11 | ||||
Michael Korb (until 1983-08-31) | 1963-08-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Roland Wohlfarth (until 1984-06-30) | 1963-01-11 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1983-08-27 15:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |